Financial history AFRICAN WOMEN GROUP

Charity number: 1106612
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.09k £25.12k £27.40k £6.70k £23.60k
Total expenditure £58.18k £22.40k £23.92k £0 £19.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A