H.O.P.E MINISTRIES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of Poverty Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2004: Standard registration
- HOPE MINISTRIES (Working name)
- HOUSE OF PRAYER FOR EVERYONE (Working name)
- HOPE MINISTRIES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Corbett | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.30k | £41.49k | £30.76k | £40.91k | £19.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.71k | £51.07k | £36.55k | £42.54k | £28.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 April 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 April 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; AND 2. THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP NEED AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 - 84 Moseley Street
Birmingham
B12 0RT
- Phone:
- 07948517736
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window