HULL COMMUNITY MEDIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 26 October 2004: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- HCM (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE CITIZEN AND COMMUNITIES IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF HULL AND THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE AND WITH A VIEW TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER, THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF BECOMING INVOLVED IN DISPUTES OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICTS WHERE ANY SUCH DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE OR BREACH OF THE PEACE.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL, EAST RIDING OR YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window