Financial history THE HOUSE OF MERCY MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1106597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.18k £2.76k £4.98k £2.56k £4.98k
Total expenditure £2.00k £2.70k £4.95k £2.54k £4.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A