Financial history CRICKHOWELL RESOURCE AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1106479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £195.66k £148.11k £204.46k £221.57k £220.43k
Total expenditure £191.36k £146.64k £186.08k £217.41k £227.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £38.98k £32.00k £7.50k N/A