GOSPEL FOR TRIBALS SOCIAL SERVICE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Child sponsorship for Indian orphans for food, clothes and education. Also providing water wells and mobile medical clinics to out reach villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 29 December 2004: Standard registration
- GTSSS (Working name)
- INDIA HOPE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nancy Morgan | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARETH FLOWERS | Trustee | 30 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
HELEN DIANNE FLOWERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £495.54k | £359.77k | £373.33k | £379.26k | £352.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £487.96k | £292.13k | £405.29k | £373.16k | £356.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; (B) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; (D) THE SUPPORT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EUROPE, ENGLAND, NORTHERN IRELAND AND INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 North Lane
Nailsea
Bristol
BS48 4BT
- Phone:
- 07504107478
- Email:
- indiahopeorphans@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window