DIAL A RIDE (SCARBOROUGH & DISTRICT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community transport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £63,292 from 2 government contract(s) and £29,332 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN JOHN WOODHEAD | Chair | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Judith Margaret Drury | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Valerie Jean Green | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER BRIDGEWOOD | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David C Jeffels Cllr | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.85k | £231.68k | £238.01k | £219.69k | £201.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.34k | £218.43k | £231.48k | £258.15k | £311.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £67.68k | £57.95k | £58.40k | £59.33k | £63.29k | |
|
Income from government grants | £37.96k | £112.66k | £76.21k | £65.13k | £29.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 DECEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 JULY 2009. as amended on 11 Sep 2019 as amended on 09 Sep 2020 as amended on 01 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF SCARBOROUGH, FILEY, WHITBY, ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND RYEDALE DISTRICT, WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, LOW EDUCATIONAL ATTAINMENT, LONG TERM UNEMPLOYMENT OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH, FILEY, WHITBY ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND RYEDALE DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIAL A RIDE UNIT 4
LONDESBOROUGH BUSINESS PARK
66 LONDESBOROUGH ROAD
SCARBOROUGH
NORTH YORKSHIRE
YO12 5AF
- Phone:
- 01723354434
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window