READING WHEELS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 14 January 2005: Standard registration
- 19 April 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATION FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN READING AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FOR SUCH PERSONS FACILITIES FOR ROLLER SKATING, SKATEBOARDING, BMX BIKING
Area of benefit
READING AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window