GEORGIAN GARDENS C.P. SCHOOL P.T.A.

Charity number: 1106660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School Summer and Xmas Fayres and various other events during the year.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 17 September 2023

Total income: £17,338
Total expenditure: £19,435

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 November 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ben David Milsom Trustee 01 March 2024
None on record
Kelly-Ann Monnery Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/09/2019 17/09/2020 17/09/2021 17/09/2022 17/09/2023
Total gross income £12.34k £10.96k £1.35k £14.69k £17.34k
Total expenditure £23.13k £11.81k £890 £5.34k £19.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 September 2023 08 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 17 September 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 17 September 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 17 September 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 17 September 2019 04 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Georgian Gardens Primary School
Guildford Road
Littlehampton
Rustington
BN16 3JJ
Phone:
01903 771555
Website:

No information available