Accounts and annual returns THE JACK RAINE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106701
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 February 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 01 February 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 01 February 2016 04 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 November 2016 On Time
Annual return 01 February 2015 07 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2015 07 August 2015 On Time