THE JACK RAINE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with hard to reach and vulnerable children, their families and community offering support in five key areas of their lives, education, welfare, health, community interest and sport. Main areas of work are; Child Sexual Exploitation (CSE), Alternative Learning Provision (ALPs), Engagement through Sport, Welfare, Substance and drink abuse and Rough Sleeping Support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 February 2016
Total income includes £11,500 from government contract(s)
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 11 November 2004: Standard registration
- 06 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ALL SAINTS AMATEUR BOXING CLUB (Working name)
- YORK BOXING CLUB AND YOUNG PEOPLES FITNESS CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/02/2012 | 01/02/2013 | 01/02/2014 | 01/02/2015 | 01/02/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.89k | £206.19k | £156.78k | £231.27k | £215.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.16k | £226.71k | £154.76k | £216.75k | £217.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.40k | £11.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2016 | 04 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 February 2016
(These accounts |
04 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 February 2015 | 07 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2015 | 07 August 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 25/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, COACHING AND EDUCATION IN BOXING AND OTHER FORMS OF CONTACT/NON-CONTACT MARTIAL ARTS. THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window