LYNEMOUTH DAY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day Centre for the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £239,969 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northumberland
Governance
- 01 November 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK BURDON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN THOMPSON | Trustee | 20 March 2015 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM TARBIT | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR EDWARD PEAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326.66k | £291.29k | £290.63k | £308.67k | £348.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £309.55k | £257.50k | £317.59k | £348.45k | £374.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £175.92k | £195.78k | £187.36k | £226.85k | £239.97k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £22.55k | £14.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY BY PROVIDING, MAINTAINING AND MANAGING A DAY CENTRE IN LYNEMOUTH FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS AND OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR SUCH PERSONS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lynemouth Day Centre Ltd
Albion Terrace
Lynemouth
Morpeth
NE61 5SY
- Phone:
- 01670861662
- Email:
- LDCOFFICE@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
lynemouthdaycentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window