RENEWABLE HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Find new uses for old buildings by adapting them to generate renewable energy. Current project: Howsham Mill, North Yorkshire, an 18th century watermill which we are restoring for use as an environmental study/community centre. The waterwheel plus two Archimedean Screw turbines will provide power for the building itself, and an income from electricity sales to support the project in the future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 23 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ali Janene Firth | Chair | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry William Chase | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Brown | Trustee | 04 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE FOX | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD MANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN CLIFFORD PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL LISTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.11k | £44.76k | £38.75k | £41.48k | £107.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.61k | £22.46k | £23.03k | £36.96k | £30.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5TH JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE LOCALITY OF ANY PROJECT UNDERTAKEN AND OF THE NATION, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND AS ANY PART OF A BUILDING AS SO DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST, WHICH MAY, WITHOUT DETRIMENT TO THE BUILDING'S HERITAGE, BE ADAPTED TO GENERATE RENEWABLE ENERGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREEBEARDS
MAIN STREET
WESTOW
YORK
YO60 7NE
- Phone:
- 01653618925
- Email:
- info@howshammill.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window