MALAWI ASSOCIATION MIDLANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has various areas of activities which it offers to the community; 1,Advisory to the community on education,health and social welfare just to mention a few. 2,Some of our members are barristers/solicitors we use their expertise on immigration and any legal law to advise and assist the community with their problems. 3, The charity provides recreations to the youth in form all sports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Derbyshire
- Leeds City
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 12 November 2004: Standard registration
- 05 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.86k | £2.87k | £15.14k | £2.34k | £2.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.79k | £2.21k | £9.94k | £2.23k | £2.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 6 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE MALAWIAN OR OF MALAWIAN DESCENT OR THOSE INTERESTED IN A CONNECTION WITH MALAWI IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL REGION OF THE MIDLANDS IN ENGLAND THROUGH: (I) RELIEVING THOSE AFFLICTED BY ABJECT POVERTY OR SICKNESS OR DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE DEATH OF FAMILY MEMBER, ANY RELATIVE OR FRIEND IN ENGLAND OR ELSEWHERE, (II) ADVANCING CULTURAL TRADITIONS OF AND CONNECTED WITH MALAWI, THROUGH THE EDUCATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE ASPECTS OF THE CULTURAL TRADITIONS OF MALAWI TO THE YOUTH OF MALAWI DESCENT OR ANY INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC (III) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED. (IV) IN OBSERVANCE AND FURTHERANCE OF THE HUMAN RIGHTS ACT 1998, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MEMBERS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND GUIDANCE WHERE AND WHEN NEED ARISES ON ISSUES OF HOUSING, HEALTH, IMMIGRATION, SOCIAL WELFARE, EMPLOYMENT AND ANY MATTERS CONNECTED WITH AND INCIDENTAL TO THE FOREGOING.
Area of benefit
MIDLANDS, ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window