FRIENDS OF RAINBOW LODGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 05 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Bathgate | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Foster | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mariama Addo | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.56k | £249 | £0 | £2.72k | £5.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.31k | £480 | £180 | £4.84k | £3.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH PHYSICAL AND LEARNING DISABILITIES AT RAINBOW LODGE BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 Invicta Road
Stone
Dartford
DA2 6AY
- Phone:
- 01322284134
- Email:
- phillipsmagee@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window