NEWHAM WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newham Welfare Trust provides support for children and elderly persons with disabilities, disadvantaged women, widows, orphans and homeless persons. It provides educational activities and training in sports, Arts, Science and Healthcare to advance knowledge and skills of young persons and disadvantaged youths in deprived areas. Newham Welfare Trust also provides emergency aid in UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 October 2004: Standard registration
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1142495 DAGENHAM BANGLADESHI WOMEN & CHILDREN'S ASSOCIATIO...
- NWT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheikh Muhammed Nunu | Chair | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laith AL-HUSSAINI | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mansoor Abdul Rahman | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.98k | £42.09k | £19.47k | £6.28k | £5.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.92k | £25.98k | £18.34k | £6.15k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED 1 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY AND BENGALI MOTHER TONGUE CLASSES. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION AND BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE IN NEED PARTICULAR UNEMPLOYMENT PERSONS BY ADVERTISING ON TRAINING SCHEMES. TO RELIEVE DISABLED AND ELDERLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED B THE PROVISION OF A DAY CENTRE AND ADVICE AND INFORMATION. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CULTURE, RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CANNING TOWN AMD CUSTOM HOUSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newham Welfare Trust
Collingwood Buildings
38 Collingwood Street
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 1JF
- Phone:
- 02079934407
- Email:
- newhamwt@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window