DUKES MEADOWS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Involving the local community in the park through regular volunteer events and free children's events. Organise a weekly farmers market to raise funds and encourage people to visit the park, manage 10 artists studios and a flat to raise revenue to fund projects. Consult the community and develop plans for capital improvements, rasise funds and implement improvements.Manage a paddling pool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hounslow
Governance
- 01 November 2004: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF DUKE'S MEADOWS (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Brian Flaherty | Trustee | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Eleanor Figaro | Trustee | 28 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Robert Sykes | Trustee | 28 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Andrew Robert Tucker | Trustee | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE BEAUCHAMP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Paul Davis | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.89k | £128.39k | £156.36k | £148.88k | £170.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.97k | £98.92k | £149.43k | £105.48k | £142.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 30 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE AREA KNOWN AS DUKE'S MEADOWS AND RIVERSIDE LANDS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND 3. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dukes Meadows Trust
The Pavilion
Market Drive
LONDON
W4 2RX
- Phone:
- 07443 591 322
- Email:
- admin@dukesmeadowstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window