Accounts and annual returns LEICESTERSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1108047
Charity reporting is overdue by 644 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 278 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 278 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 644 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 644 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 12 June 2023 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 12 June 2023 317 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 04 August 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 August 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 August 2020 20 days late Download Open in new window