Financial history LEICESTERSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1108047
Charity reporting is overdue by 644 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £138.62k £115.38k £102.34k £12.81k £37.67k
Total expenditure £120.42k £137.03k £65.30k £14.49k £30.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A