RIGHT START FOUNDATION INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public with special emphasis towards minority ethnic groups in the UK and abroad concerning marriage, family life, relationships and employability.Empowering women and adolescent girls of minority ethnic groups through developing skill programmes.Facilitating the rehabilitation of drug misuse offenders through provision of non-medical treatment and skill programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Bradford City
- City Of London
- Manchester City
- Egypt
Governance
- 08 April 2005: Standard registration
- 27 August 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- RIGHT START FOUNDATION LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £690.50k | £313.60k | £8.07k | £100.77k | £679 | |
|
Total expenditure | £880.71k | £635.94k | £580.52k | £671.93k | £119.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £499.45k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £688.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £871.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £432.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £9.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 13 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 16 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | 16 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/01/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/04/2006 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/08/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE 'OBJECTS') ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE, AWARENESS AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING OF DIFFERENT BELIEFS, CULTURES AND PEOPLE, INCLUDING BY PROMOTING VOLUNTEERISM AND CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY IN YOUNG PEOPLE; 3.1.2 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION INCLUDING BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; 3.1.3 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF YOUNG PEOPLE, WITH A SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON MINORITY ETHNIC GROUPS IN THE UK AND ABROAD, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF ADVANCING THEM IN LIFE AND HELPING THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND 3.1.4 TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO, OR DEPENDENCY UPON, DRUGS, ALCOHOL OR OTHER SUBSTANCES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, SUPPORT AND NON-MEDICAL TREATMENT, AND BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND AWARENESS OF THE RISKS AND NEGATIVE IMPACT OF DRUG USE AND THE AVAILABILITY OF REHABILITATION AND TREATMENTS FOR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DRUG ADDICTION. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE OBJECTS 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Area of benefit
UK AND ABROAD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window