Financial history BURLINGTON SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £34.78k £13.74k £10.25k £41.43k £46.86k
Total expenditure £18.53k £6.24k £38.45k £44.27k £28.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A