LTC TRUST CO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Establishing or assisting the maintenance and operation of a college for the education and training of rabbis, ministers, readers, teachers and other talmudic scholars. 2. To assist such rabbis and students who are in need by providing accomodation, maintenance grants, books and such other relief as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 November 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID BENZION LANDAU | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|||||||||
MANNY WEISS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £327.14k | £339.53k | £297.59k | £382.13k | £390.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £327.06k | £322.82k | £303.12k | £358.66k | £349.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR(BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY A. ESTABLISHING OR ASSISTING IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AND MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF A COLLEGE FOR THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF RABBIS, MINISTERS, READERS, TEACHERS AND OTHER TALMUDIC SCHOLARS; AND B. TO ASSIST SUCH RABBIS AND STUDENTS WHO ARE IN NEED BY PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION, MAINTENANCE GRANTS, BOOKS AND SUCH OTHER RELIEF AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Durweston Street
London
W1H 1EW
- Phone:
- 02070163525
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window