Accounts and annual returns FAITH MINISTRIES UK CHURCHES

Charity number: 1106723
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 August 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 August 2024 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 07 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window