Financial history FAITH MINISTRIES UK CHURCHES

Charity number: 1106723
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £208.06k £226.63k £226.29k £290.04k £297.86k
Total expenditure £256.45k £215.17k £233.87k £247.64k £300.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A