REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD CHAPEL OF GLORY INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To seek the advancement of the Christian religion in accordance with the teachings of the Redeemed Christian Church of God and to educate people in the Word of God. To teach the knowledge of Jesus Christ all over Watford and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
- Nigeria
Governance
- 10 November 2004: Standard registration
- RCCG CHAPEL OF GLORY INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLAJIDE ALABI | Trustee |
|
||||||
SEMANDE KAYODE TANIMOWO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLAYINKA BAZUAYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BABADAMILOLA SIYANBOLA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.43k | £75.97k | £83.64k | £111.01k | £123.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.65k | £38.32k | £37.90k | £59.64k | £81.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 February 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 February 2024 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
2.2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. 2.2.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 GREENBANK ROAD
WATFORD
WD17 4FL
- Phone:
- 07813492423
- Email:
- rccgcogi@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window