COTSWOLD FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cotswold Friends provides transport, carer respite and befriending services, and lunch clubs to elderly, disabled and isolated residents of the Cotswolds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £139,266 from 17 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
340 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- COTSWOLD VOLUNTEERS NORTH (Previous name)
- NORTH COTSWOLDS VOLUNTARY HELP CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bridget Salvage | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Robert Pimm | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Dennis | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Nigel Moor | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ASAD NOORANI | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|||||||
GARY MARTYN SELWYN | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||||
Diane Bell | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Ivan Ridgers | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Richard Benn | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.23k | £360.25k | £334.76k | £349.77k | £427.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273.16k | £317.40k | £370.63k | £373.62k | £404.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £78.40k | £101.00k | £75.93k | £78.48k | £139.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT THE COTSWOLDS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; AND B) TO PROVIDE A CENTRE FOR THE RECRUITMENT, GUIDANCE AND DEPLOYMENT OF VOLUNTEERS TO ACHIEVE THE ABOVE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cotswold Friends
Moreton Area Centre
High Street
MORETON-IN-MARSH
GL56 0AZ
- Phone:
- 01608651415
- Email:
- info@cotswoldfriends.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window