AFRICA MAMAS ASSOCIATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Daily drop-in advice and information services. Outreach work, seminars/workshops and event on health promotion. Training for employment. Visiting detainees. Networking and liaising in partnerships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 November 2004: Standard registration
- 14 October 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- A.M.A.UK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2007 | 30/04/2008 | 30/04/2009 | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.05k | £6.40k | £5.00k | £9.50k | £9.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £6.21k | £5.00k | £9.40k | £8.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | 23 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF AFRICAN WOMEN REGUGE AND NON-REFUGEE AND THEIR DEPENDENT RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF REGARDING THEIR EDUCATIONAL, TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT NEEDS AS WELL AS ADVICE ON HEALTH MATTERS, HOUSING, IMMIGRATION, INTERPRETING/TRANSLATING AND ADVOCACY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window