BSCAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the public the study, teaching and use of hypnosis in the fields of medicine, dentistry and psychology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 March 2005: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL HYPNOSIS (Working name)
- BSECH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Wall | Chair | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shamsh Suleman | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN HARGREAVES | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|||||
DR MAUREEN TILFORD | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.77k | £161.13k | £111.06k | £106.46k | £46.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.31k | £81.13k | £135.20k | £118.37k | £71.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 MAY 2007. as amended on 14 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE STUDY, TEACHING AND USE OF HYPNOSIS IN THE FIELDS OF MEDICINE, DENTISTRY AND PSYCHOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLLY BANK HOUSE
LEES ROAD
MOSSLEY
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
OL5 0PL
- Phone:
- 07702492867
- Email:
- natoffice@bscah.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window