Financial history FREEDOM CENTRE

Charity number: 1106874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/12/2019 10/12/2020 10/12/2021 10/12/2022 10/12/2023
Total gross income £100.06k £114.05k £137.16k £104.15k £91.69k
Total expenditure £108.54k £87.43k £117.75k £104.01k £115.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A