SELF INJURY SUPPORT IN NORTH CUMBRIA LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Self Injury Support in North Cumbria supports people aged 11 years and over, we offer professionally qualified counselling, group support, library loan resource, website, self-harm awareness training, and opportunities for the personal development of service users. Support is by self referral but initial contact can be made through another agency or person.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 12 November 2004: Standard registration
- 18 September 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SIS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2007 | 31/05/2008 | 31/05/2009 | 31/05/2010 | 31/05/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.79k | £40.51k | £96.17k | £122.90k | £99.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.99k | £77.61k | £80.61k | £110.88k | £116.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2011 | 27 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2011 | 27 February 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | 22 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | 22 March 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | 09 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | 22 December 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
A) RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF PERSONS WHO SELF INJURE AND ARE EMOTIONALLY DISTRESSED THEREBY BY OFFERING INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING TO SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES; B) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT SELF INJURY AND MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES RELATED TO SELF INJURY.
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window