WOODFORD VALLEY LINK SCHEME

Charity number: 1106825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of services calculated to reduce the need, hardship or distress of poor, sick, elderly or disabled persons in the Parishes of Durnford, Wilsford-cum-Lake and Woodford

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,728
Total expenditure: £2,125

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 November 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER CURBISHLEY Chair 13 May 2019
HOME-START SOUTH WILTSHIRE
Received: On time
Fiona Jayne Hinds Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Jean Rebecca Fay Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Pauline Virginia Shingles Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Charles Francis Houghton Beckford Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
Louise Jopling Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Elisabeth Parks Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
Carol Wippell Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
ROSHEEN RYAN Trustee 25 February 2013
None on record
LT COL HUGH DESMOND HEBER KEATINGE OBE Trustee
None on record
DAPHNE INCE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.83k £2.36k £939 £1.23k £2.73k
Total expenditure £2.61k £1.01k £1.06k £1.59k £2.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 April 2024 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Willow House
Great Durnford
SALISBURY
SP4 6AZ
Phone:
01722782695
Website:

No information available