MATTHEWS FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To publicise the ketogenic diet and make it a first line treatment for childhood epilepsy instead of a last resort. To give parents and informed choice and an alternative to medication To support parents/carers and children once on the diet. To provide finding to help with education and training in the administration of the ketogenic diet to make it more available
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE FRANCES FOUNTAIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE MARY ALDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD ALDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £674.63k | £111.80k | £476.64k | £133.92k | £97.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.87k | £141.09k | £488.86k | £169.90k | £214.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.65k | £71 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £562.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £100.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £429 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £460.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £100.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £34.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £32 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £29.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/04/2011 as amended on 07 Mar 2023 as amended on 31 May 2023
Charitable objects
The relief of people with known complex and intractable epilepsy and the specific neurometabolic disorder GLUT1 deficiency syndrome by providing a) Information and advice on the Ketogenic Diet (an alternative treatment to medication), and support for patients/parents/carers once on the diet, and b) Any charitable means which the trustees decide including: a) To publicise Ketogenic Dietary Therapies and make them more available to all those who should need it, be it child or adult. b) Together with our medical board, give parents and patients an informed choice about the Ketogenic Diet and to source and provide the latest information available. c) To support families and patients through their dietary therapy. d) To support professionals in their administration of dietary therapies by way of literature, ketogenic starter packs and files, educational conferences and training meetings and provide funding, where possible. e) To support Research projects into the efficacy of these dietary treatments for use in Epilepsy and other conditions, working with medical professionals to ensure our information is safe, relevant and current.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Young Epilepsy
St Piers Lane
Lingfield
Surrey
RH7 6PW
- Phone:
- 01342 836571
- Email:
- enq@matthewsfriends.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window