Financial history THE BEDFORD AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1106738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £535.11k £595.42k £524.68k £641.99k £609.72k
Total expenditure £490.83k £513.48k £514.88k £518.20k £705.98k
Income from government contracts £197.51k N/A N/A £378.72k £296.19k
Income from government grants £72.83k £192.51k £217.58k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £150 £1.00k £126 £126 £302
Income - Other trading activities £0 £2.49k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £526.08k £590.39k £523.47k £523.47k £597.59k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.63k £1.54k £1.08k £1.08k £2.40k
Income - Other £7.25k £0 £0 £0 £9.44k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £490.83k £513.48k £514.88k £518.20k £705.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.44k £8.59k £14.50k £6.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0