THE INTEGRATION CENTRE FOR IVORIANS IN THE UK (ICI)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 February 2005: Standard registration
- 05 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ADOPTED ON 20 JUNE 2004, AS AMENDED 16 DECEMBER 2004, AS AMENDED 22 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS OF IVORIAN OR OTHER FRENCH-SPEAKING AFRICAN ORIGIN (THE BENEFICIARIES) BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON ASYLUM AND IMMIGRATION MATTERS, HOUSING, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, IDENTIFYING EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING SERVICES WHERE REQUIRED. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG THE BENEFICIARIES BY THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN ACCESSING, SKILLS TRAINING AND LANGUAGE COURSES. (III) THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window