WILLOW FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1106746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Willow supports seriously ill 16 to 40 year olds throughout the UK to get more out of life by providing unique and unforgettable Special Days and Special Treats. For some it gives a positive focus away from diagnosis and treatment and may be a final chance to create lasting memories. For others it marks recovery, boosting confidence and providing motivation to move forward with their lives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD KING Chair
FARESHARE
Received: On time
James David Newman Trustee 27 September 2024
None on record
Sangita Vadilal Manilal Shah Trustee 14 June 2024
None on record
PAUL PHEDON Trustee 03 February 2023
None on record
Vanessa Steel Trustee 24 September 2021
FELINE FRIENDS LONDON
Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Martin John Ryan Trustee 18 May 2020
None on record
GLYN DEREK TAYLOR Trustee 11 April 2019
None on record
Elena Ciallie Trustee 27 June 2017
None on record
DAVID WADDINGTON MA RAF Trustee 16 December 2015
None on record
Nick Aldridge Trustee 03 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.44m £2.17m £2.25m £2.86m £3.40m
Total expenditure £3.60m £2.07m £2.23m £2.73m £3.51m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £246.39k £61.58k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.90m £1.40m £1.49m £1.59m £1.65m
Income - Other trading activities £1.46m £730.15k £714.53k £1.20m £1.66m
Income - Charitable activities £26.08k £0 £0 £0 £13.51k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £52.93k £46.34k £51.22k £63.86k £74.75k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.16k £0 £3.26k £12.06k £19.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.51m £775.24k £808.06k £1.04m £1.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.09m £1.29m £1.42m £1.69m £2.01m
Expenditure - Governance £17.14k £8.91k £5.19k £12.26k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.79k £12.79k £15.13k £13.82k £19.47k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £66.02k £36.94k £25.96k £9.94k £83.56k
Long-term investments £2.25m £2.34m £2.64m £2.22m £2.39m
Other assets £549.43k £1.10m £650.96k £770.95k £631.05k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £406.84k £689.86k £240.94k £258.85k £350.82k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Willow
Gate House
Fretherne Road
WELWYN GARDEN CITY
AL8 6NS
Phone:
01707259777