Financial history CROSSLEY STREET PRIMARY SCHOOL P.T.A.

Charity number: 1106858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £14.29k £8.72k £5.58k £9.14k £12.04k
Total expenditure £11.82k £24.49k £2.28k £15.11k £6.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £275