Prevent Breast Cancer

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fund ground-breaking research into the prediction and prevention of breast cancer. Our four pillars of research are gene research, improved screening & early diagnosis, preventative drugs and diet & lifestyle. Our overall aim is to make breast cancer a preventable disease for our future generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,472,692
Donations and legacies | £1.30m | |
Charitable activities | £65.11k | |
Other trading activities | £56.35k | |
Investments | £47.41k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,594,010
Raising funds | £294.63k | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other | £0 |
£62,199 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £294.63k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.30m |
People

14 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 June 2005: Standard registration
- GENESIS BREAST CANCER PREVENTION APPEAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- PREVENT BREAST CANCER LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE GENESIS APPEAL COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE GENESIS APPEAL FOR GENE RESEARCH INTO BREAST CANCER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eamonn O'Neal | Chair | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tammy Hopla | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sellers | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Topham | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Humphris | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Saleh | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Harris | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE LEE-JONES | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARY WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESTER BARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAM GLASS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39m | £672.07k | £1.13m | £1.45m | £1.47m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.19m | £438.98k | £517.68k | £1.14m | £1.59m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.24m | £589.28k | £1.01m | £1.32m | £1.30m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £67.31k | £50.96k | £72.94k | £56.19k | £56.35k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £66.84k | £25.02k | £41.63k | £59.16k | £65.11k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.34k | £6.81k | £7.57k | £17.34k | £47.41k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £12.83k | £0 | £560.77k | £55.28k | £151.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £944.53k | £348.83k | £369.04k | £838.09k | £1.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £247.23k | £90.15k | £148.64k | £305.78k | £294.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.30k | £10.51k | £10.81k | £10.43k | £13.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £396.09k | £7.94k | £12.20k | £271.86k | £137.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £6.19k | £4.85k | £5.36k | £6.01k | £5.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £567 | £252 | £1.27k | £2.70k | £4.51k | |
|
Long-term investments | £366.25k | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £620.29k | £1.10m | £1.58m | £2.10m | £2.11m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £487.31k | £262.84k | £118.69k | £374.56k | £449.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 MAY 2005 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 9 JUNE 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 MAY 2016 as amended on 26 Apr 2022 as amended on 13 Aug 2024 as amended on 03 Sept 2024 as amended on 31 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
The advancement of health by the prevention of breast cancer for the public benefit worldwide but in particular in the United Kingdom by: - i. Funding research into the causes, prevention, detection and early diagnosis of breast cancer and that the results of the research are promoted and published for the public benefit; ii. Participating in, facilitating or supporting national and international research and development to overcome health inequalities in all aspects of breast cancer prevention among UK ethnic and cultural groups and to disseminate and share output from such programmes to improve breast cancer outcomes for these communities; iii. Informing, raising awareness, so that the public can learn and educate themselves by producing, disseminating and promoting important public health messages about breast cancer risks, symptoms, detection and treatment; iv. Supporting and raising awareness of technological and all other scientific, best practice and diagnostic advancements in breast screening including but not, limited to the support for the National Breast Imaging Academy; v. Providing pastoral services to support patients and their families affected by breast cancer, including but not limited to patient welcoming, orientation, break out spaces and refreshments at the breast screening unit; vi. Advancing all aspects of breast cancer prediction, detection, risk reduction, management, prevention and diagnosis; and vii. Advancing such other aspects of breast cancer prevention as medical and technological advances may recognise and develop in the future, as the trustees in their absolute discretion may determine.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NIGHTINGALE CENTRE
WYTHENSHAWE HOSPITAL
SOUTHMOOR ROAD
MANCHESTER
M23 9LT
- Phone:
- 07841357392
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window