Financial history MALAGO PLAY ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1106744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £75.88k £53.12k £100.03k £101.88k £108.81k
Total expenditure £85.02k £67.07k £61.67k £87.14k £104.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.40k £22.25k £5.00k N/A N/A