AFRICAN REVIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Vision is an Africa where every child has equal access to quality education. We do not just build infrastructure and provide livelihood and education projects; we empower whole communities - working with pupils, teachers and parents to transform schools into thriving learning environments that build better futures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- South Sudan
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 24 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY ALLEN | Chair | 02 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Inch | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Wilson | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Grace Sarpong | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Ian Clark | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|||||
ROY DE BOISE | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
GLEN WILLIAM JAMES MA | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
BERNARD JOHN STEVENS | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LEONARD BEIGHTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £665.91k | £453.80k | £643.18k | £505.76k | £492.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £625.05k | £423.59k | £461.77k | £614.70k | £618.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £640.39k | N/A | £381.20k | £260.04k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £21.96k | N/A | £1.61k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £259.17k | £243.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.55k | N/A | £1.20k | £2.32k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £600.88k | N/A | £358.17k | £478.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £24.16k | N/A | £103.60k | £136.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.60k | N/A | £5.77k | £8.10k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £92.43k | N/A | £58.94k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JULY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 20 OCTOBER 2004 AND 28 FEBRUARY 2005. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST THE POOREST COMMUNITIES IN AFRICA (B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES. ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED [INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID].
Area of benefit
AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodhall Barns
Hungry Hill Lane
Send
WOKING
Surrey
GU23 7LG
- Phone:
- 07834362120
- Email:
- info@africanrevival.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window