CHINESE ASSOCIATION OF WOKING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the running of a Chinese Saturday school, Chinese Language Playgroups for the under 5s, a Chinese Community Project, a Children's Chinese Library Project and supports various Chinese cultural activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
99 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 May 2005: Standard registration
- CA WOKING (Working name)
- CAW (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jing Chang | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adelina Berishaj | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bin Li | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
WiNNiE Kwong | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Feng | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Roger James | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yue Li | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Qinmin Zhang | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fan Hong Kong | Trustee | 14 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSIE SAU-CHING JAMIESON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANITA CHI WAI HO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.47k | £65.84k | £35.43k | £44.22k | £56.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.64k | £48.32k | £38.60k | £45.34k | £63.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF CHINESE CULTURE, ARTS, TRADITION, HISTORY AND LANGUAGE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO PERSONS OF CHINESE ORIGIN OR DESCENT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS, RESIDENT OR WORKING WITHIN (BUT NOT LIMITED TO ) THE BOROUGH OF WOKING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"),THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF EDUCATION, HEALTH, SOCIAL WELFARE AND RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE SOCIAL EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WOKING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (BUT NOT LIMITED TO)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Restwynde
Pyrford Woods
WOKING
Surrey
GU22 8QR
- Phone:
- 07917 758998
- Email:
- chairman@cawoking.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window