HEACHAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CAR SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community car scheme, offering transport from a persons home, if they are unable to use any public transport, to doctors surgeries, other appointments, shopping etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,970 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM DAVID HEMMINGS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lisa Upshaw | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hodgson | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Winston Williams | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Mortlock | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.15k | £15.43k | £18.20k | £13.10k | £15.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.27k | £18.06k | £19.98k | £19.54k | £19.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.45k | £6.62k | £7.17k | £7.42k | £7.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED 15 FEBRUARY 2005. as amended on 22 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO TRANSPORT THOSE ELIGIBLE PERSONS LIVING WITHIN THE AREA COVERED BY THE HEACHAM GROUP MEDICAL PRACTICE, THE CAROL BROWN HEALTH CENTRE, DERSINGHAM, THE THE HUNSTANTON MEDICAL PRACTICE. THIS INCLUDES THE VILLAGES OF HEACHAM, SNETTISHAM, INGOLDISTHORPE, RINGSTEAD, SEDGEFORD, FRING, SHERNBORNE, DERSINGHAM, ANMER, WOLFERTON, WEST NEWTON, HOLME-NEXT-THE-SEA, OLD HUNSTANTON, THE SANDRINGHAM ESTATE AND THE TOWN OF HUNSTANTON. PERSONS WHO ARE ELIGIBLE TO USE THE SERVICE ARE THOSE WHO ARE UNABLE TO USE PUBLIC TRANSPORT TO ATTEND MEDICAL CENTRES OR OTHER ACTIVITIES AS APPROVED BY THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE BECAUSE OF INCAPACITY. THESE PERSONS, TOGETHER WITH THE SCHEME'S DRIVERS AND VOLUNTEERS AND ELECTED REPRESENTATIVES FROM THE COVERED AREA SHALL BE DEEMED TO BE ELIGIBLE PERSONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENSURING THAT MEETINGS ARE QUORATE. THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL CONSIDER REQUESTS FROM RESIDENTS OF THE ABOVE VILLAGES, TOWN AND ESTATES WHO DO NOT APPEAR TO FULFIL THESE CRITERIA.
Area of benefit
THE AREA COVERED BY THE HEACHAM GROUP MEDICAL PRACTICE, THE CAROL BROWN HEALTH CENTRE, DERSINGHAM, THE THE HUNSTANTON MEDICAL PRACTICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hunstanton Community Centre
Avenue Road
HUNSTANTON
PE36 5BW
- Phone:
- 01485534777
- Email:
- gabbymortlock@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window