AFRICAN MEDICAL ADVICE AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide skill training in health care and IT for the over 50s BME & medical advice, support and care work for the disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Barnet
- Bromley
- Camden
- City Of London
- Croydon
- Enfield
- Greenwich
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Hungary
- Nigeria
Governance
- 12 January 2005: Standard registration
- AFRICAN MEDICAL ADVICE & INFORMATION CENTRE (Working name)
- AFRICAN MEDICAL ADVICE CENTRE (Working name)
- AMAC (Working name)
- THE MEDICAL ADVICE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chinyere MERCY IBEH Mrs | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Nkwocha | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2017 | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £980 | £2.50k | £2.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298 | £600 | £2.00k | £550 | £5.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 05 OCTOBER 2003, AS AMENDED 14 DECEMBER 2004 AND 20 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF MINORITY ETHNIC MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF GREENWICH AND LEWISHAM AND ALSO THE INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF OF GREENWICH & LEWISHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 THORNTREE ROAD
LONDON
SE7 8TT
- Phone:
- 07391051411
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window