Accounts and annual returns BI-AURA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1108966
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 October 2020 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 May 2019 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 May 2019 112 days late