CROSS CULTURAL MINISTRY IN WOKING

Charity Number: 1106905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

VARIOUS TRAINING COURSES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES (SUCH AS SOCIAL AND PRAYER GATHERINGS) TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF CROSS CULTURAL MINISTRY.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,262
Total expenditure: £5,886

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ACROSS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NGAR LAI CANDY WONG Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Rev Nick Hutchinson Trustee 19 September 2017
HENRY SMITH (SHARE WARBLETON ESTATE)
Received: On time
FIONA MARY IRWIN Trustee
None on record
RACHEL JANE SIMPSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.50k £12.97k £8.33k £13.90k £8.26k
Total expenditure £14.60k £9.88k £9.79k £9.55k £5.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Andrews Church
The Goldsworth Park Centre
Goldsworth Park
WOKING
GU21 3LG
Phone:
07792691208