Financial history DRAGON TALE THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 1107712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.87k £15.64k £2.75k £9.09k £16.46k
Total expenditure £26.60k £5.66k £6.01k £9.02k £17.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.20k £11.40k N/A N/A £1.90k