Financial history Cambridge Money Advice Centre (MAC)

Charity Number: 1107655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.56k £26.47k £23.03k £20.35k £13.26k
Total expenditure £15.21k £15.93k £22.12k £18.70k £20.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k N/A