Accounts and annual returns THE PONTARDAWE ARENA

Charity number: 1106812
Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 16 April 2025 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 15 August 2024 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 15 August 2024 192 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 September 2023 231 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 September 2023 231 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 06 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 14 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window