THE PONTARDAWE ARENA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
community regeneration
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £28,575 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 16 November 2004: Standard registration
- ARENA PONTARDAWE (Working name)
- ARENA WALES CYMRU (Working name)
- GLANTAWE OUTDOOR EDUCATION ACADEMY (Working name)
- PONTARDAWE ARENA PARTNERSHIP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keidi Winter | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jay | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JONES | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.77k | £64.20k | £90.70k | £85.61k | £73.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.10k | £63.19k | £87.79k | £99.00k | £83.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £29.68k | £27.40k | £28.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 192 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 September 2023 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 September 2023 | 231 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE. B) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS: C) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; E) BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED, SUBJECT TO PRIOR AGREEMENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
SWANSEA VALLEY, NEATH PORT TALBOT, WEST GLAMORGAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Heol Glanllechau
Alltwen
Pontardawe
SWANSEA
SA8 3AP
- Phone:
- 07780974598
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window