RIVERSIDE MIDDLE SCHOOL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds towards improving facilities for pupils i.e climbing wall, leavers' prizes Support of individual pupils for cost of trips. Collection of pupils' payments for school trips i.e ski trip, French trip etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 November 2004: Standard registration
- 25 June 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.71k | £125.62k | £183.52k | £77.60k | £39.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.08k | £98.20k | £177.40k | £82.83k | £36.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 28 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 08 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 11 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 17 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 13 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 19 May 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 27 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 24 March 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF RIVERSIDE MIDDLE SCHOOL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE SCHOOL")BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT (DFEE). IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF RIVERSIDE MIDDLE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window