BICKERSTAFFE EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of persons resident in Bickerstaffe parish or attending Bickerstaffe C.E.School. In particular but not exclusive of children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MERRICK WILLIAM RIMMER | Chair | 23 January 2005 |
|
|||||||
Albert Webster | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Kirstin Carlin | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Emmott | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JONATHAN PETER RAWLINSON | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Andrew Housley | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|||||||
ANNE HILARY ROSBOTHAM-WILLIAMS | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|
||||||
JOSEPHINE MARY O'NEILL | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|
||||||
Hilary Anne Rosbotham | Trustee | 23 January 2005 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.85k | £9.13k | £13.92k | £10.13k | £9.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.87k | £9.76k | £9.41k | £3.67k | £6.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BICKERSTAFFE OR ATTENDING BICKERSTAFFE VOLUNTARY CONTROLLED SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
BICKERSTAFFE, ORMSKIRK, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRIMROSE COTTAGE
HALL LANE
BICKERSTAFFE
ORMSKIRK
LANCASHIRE
L39 0EH
- Phone:
- 01695727848
- Email:
- merrick.rimmer@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window